TX SCR56 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring John Cowan on the occasion of his retirement from the Texas Association of Dairymen.
Title
Honoring John Cowan on the occasion of his retirement from the Texas Association of Dairymen.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Fraser [R] | Rep. Sid Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-26 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-26 | Adopted | |
2011-05-26 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-19 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Read & adopted | |
2011-05-19 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |