TX SCR55 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of the lives of John Clinton Formby and Margaret Clark Formby.
Title
In memory of the lives of John Clinton Formby and Margaret Clark Formby.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-20 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-20 | Adopted | |
2011-05-20 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-20 | Printed in full | |
2011-05-20 | Again read | |
2011-05-20 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-17 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Read & adopted | |
2011-05-17 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |