TX SCR51 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Urging appropriate state agencies to support the establishment of a veterans memorial in Conroe.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Urging appropriate state agencies to support the establishment of a veterans memorial in Conroe.


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Adopted RV#1809 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseLaid before the House
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2017-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-03SenateRecord vote
2017-05-03SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-18SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-04-18SenateRead first time
2017-04-18SenatePermission to introduce
2017-04-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments