TX SCR51 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing the legislature's support for the construction of a monument to African American Texans on the grounds of the State Capitol at the location approved by the State Preservation Board for a Juneteenth monument.
Title
Expressing the legislature's support for the construction of a monument to African American Texans on the grounds of the State Capitol at the location approved by the State Preservation Board for a Juneteenth monument.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Adopted | |
2011-05-23 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to House Administration | |
2011-05-19 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Adopted | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-05-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-17 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-04 | Referred to Administration | |
2011-05-04 | Read first time | |
2011-05-04 | Permission to introduce | |
2011-05-04 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AFRICAN AMERICAN TEXANS MONUMENT
PRESERVATION BOARD, STATE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS
PRESERVATION BOARD, STATE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS