TX SCR50 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the governor of the State of Texas to award the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor to U.S. Army Private Marcelino Serna and to U.S. Coast Guard Seaman Apprentice William Ray Flores.
Title
Directing the governor of the State of Texas to award the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor to U.S. Army Private Marcelino Serna and to U.S. Coast Guard Seaman Apprentice William Ray Flores.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - House - Adopted RV#1716 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-29 | House | Record vote RV#1716 |
2021-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-29 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2021-05-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-24 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2021-05-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
FLORES, WILLIAM RAY
LEGISLATIVE MEDAL OF HONOR, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
SERNA, MARCELINO
LEGISLATIVE MEDAL OF HONOR, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
SERNA, MARCELINO