TX SCR5 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to repeal the Government Pension Offset and the Windfall Elimination Provision of the Social Security Act.
Title
Urging Congress to repeal the Government Pension Offset and the Windfall Elimination Provision of the Social Security Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HCR19 (Same As) 2019-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Subjects
GOVERNMENT PENSION OFFSET
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
SOCIAL SECURITY ACT
WINDFALL ELIMINATION PROVISION
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
SOCIAL SECURITY ACT
WINDFALL ELIMINATION PROVISION