TX SCR5 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designating Rockwall as the official Live Music Capital of North Texas.
Title
Designating Rockwall as the official Live Music Capital of North Texas.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-12-29 | Senate | Filed |
2016-12-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
LIVE MUSIC CAPITAL OF NORTH TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Capitals
ROCKWALL, CITY OF
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Capitals
ROCKWALL, CITY OF