TX SCR5 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to reimburse the State of Texas for bearing the financial burden of the federal government's responsibility to secure the Texas-Mexico international border.
Title
Urging Congress to reimburse the State of Texas for bearing the financial burden of the federal government's responsibility to secure the Texas-Mexico international border.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-23 - House - SCR 5Third Reading House (Y: 99 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-24 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-23 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-23 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2015-05-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2015-03-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Border Security by Pres |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |