TX SCR49 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of the life of Robert Russell Barnett.
Title
In memory of the life of Robert Russell Barnett.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-19 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-19 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-19 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |