TX SCR48 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing the Washington County Chamber of Commerce for 100 years of service to the community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the Washington County Chamber of Commerce for 100 years of service to the community.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-19HouseAdopted
2017-05-19HouseLaid before the House
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Rules and Resolutions
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2017-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-10SenateRead & adopted
2017-04-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback