TX SCR48 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recalling S.B. No. 785 from the governor for clerical correction.
Title
Recalling S.B. No. 785 from the governor for clerical correction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-04-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-04-28 | Signed in the House | |
2011-04-28 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-04-27 | House passage reported | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Adopted | |
2011-04-26 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Adopted | |
2011-04-26 | Read | |
2011-04-26 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
Family
Family--Child Support
Family--Parent & Child
PATERNITY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Recall
Family
Family--Child Support
Family--Parent & Child
PATERNITY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Recall