TX SCR41 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress to direct the Department of Defense to relocate the United States Africa Command to Ellington Field Joint Reserve Base in Houston.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to direct the Department of Defense to relocate the United States Africa Command to Ellington Field Joint Reserve Base in Houston.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Adopted RV#1808 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseAdopted
2017-05-24HouseLaid before the House
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-12HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-10HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-09HouseReferred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateAdopted
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-04SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-29SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-22SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-03-22SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback