TX SCR4 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-01-16 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 10, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, January 15, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 10, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, January 15, 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-09 - House - Adopted RV#5 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-16 Filed with the Secretary of State
2019-01-16HouseSigned in the House
2019-01-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-01-15SenateReported enrolled
2019-01-15SenateHouse passage reported
2019-01-09HouseRecord vote RV#5
2019-01-09HouseAdopted
2019-01-09HouseLaid before the House
2019-01-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-01-08SenateRecord vote
2019-01-08SenateAdopted
2019-01-08SenateRead
2019-01-08SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-01-08SenateFiled
2019-01-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback