TX SCR4 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 15, 2015, and ending on Tuesday, January 20, 2015.
Title
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 15, 2015, and ending on Tuesday, January 20, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-14 - House - SCR 4Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-01-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-01-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-01-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-01-14 | House | Record vote |
2015-01-14 | House | Adopted |
2015-01-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-01-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Read |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |