TX SCR38 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. No. 2975.
Title
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. No. 2975.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-27 - House - SCR 38Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-27 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |