TX SCR35 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to reimburse the State of Texas for bearing the financial burden of the federal government's responsibility to secure the Texas-Mexico international border.
Title
Urging Congress to reimburse the State of Texas for bearing the financial burden of the federal government's responsibility to secure the Texas-Mexico international border.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2017-04-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |