TX SCR33 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Approving the amended 2009 settlement agreement between the State of Texas and the U.S. Department of Justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approving the amended 2009 settlement agreement between the State of Texas and the U.S. Department of Justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-27 - House - Adopted RV#1943 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-27 - House - Adopted RV#1942 (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-27HouseRecord vote
2017-05-27HouseAdopted
2017-05-27HouseVote reconsidered
2017-05-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-27HouseRecord vote
2017-05-27HouseAdopted
2017-05-27HouseRules suspended
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Human Services
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-25SenateRecord vote
2017-04-25SenateAdopted
2017-04-25SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-03-16SenateRead first time
2017-03-08SenateFiled
2017-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback