TX SCR33 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Approving the amended 2009 settlement agreement between the State of Texas and the U.S. Department of Justice.
Title
Approving the amended 2009 settlement agreement between the State of Texas and the U.S. Department of Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-27 - House - Adopted RV#1943 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-27 - House - Adopted RV#1942 (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-27 - House - Adopted RV#1942 (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-27 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2017-05-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |