TX SCR32 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to provide sufficient federal funding for the construction of a storm surge barrier along the Texas coast.
Title
Urging Congress to provide sufficient federal funding for the construction of a storm surge barrier along the Texas coast.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Coastal Affairs & Beaches
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress