TX SCR32 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - Referred to State Sovereignty, Select
Pending: House State Sovereignty, Select Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - Referred to State Sovereignty, Select
Pending: House State Sovereignty, Select Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing opposition to federal regulation of intrastate water resources.
Title
Expressing opposition to federal regulation of intrastate water resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Referred to State Sovereignty, Select | |
2011-05-09 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-09 | Record vote | |
2011-05-09 | Adopted | |
2011-05-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-09 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-09 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S.
FEDERAL WATER POLLUTION CONTROL ACT
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
WATER
Water--Rights
FEDERAL WATER POLLUTION CONTROL ACT
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
WATER
Water--Rights