TX SCR31 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designating Hico as the official Steak Capital of Texas.
Title
Designating Hico as the official Steak Capital of Texas.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Fraser [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | No action taken in committee |
2015-05-12 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2015-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
HICO, CITY OF
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Capitals
STEAK CAPITAL OF TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Capitals
STEAK CAPITAL OF TEXAS