TX SCR3 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Condemning China's practice of involuntary organ harvesting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condemning China's practice of involuntary organ harvesting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - Adopted RV#1295 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1295
2021-05-20HouseAdopted
2021-05-20HouseLaid before the House
2021-05-20HousePlaced on Resolutions Calendar
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-22HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-19HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-15SenateRecord vote
2021-04-15SenateAdopted
2021-04-15SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-15SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-12SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-02SenateCo-author authorized
2021-02-23SenateCo-author authorized
2021-01-26SenateCo-author authorized
2021-01-14SenateFiled
2021-01-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SCR3
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SC00003I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SC00003S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SC00003E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SC00003H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SC00003F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SC00003I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SC00003S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SC00003F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-15-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SCR3&RcdVtNo=1295&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2021

Bill Comments

feedback