TX SCR3 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 15 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-16 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 15 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-16 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for a joint session to canvass the votes for the governor and lieutenant governor and for a joint session for the inaugural ceremony.
Title
Providing for a joint session to canvass the votes for the governor and lieutenant governor and for a joint session for the inaugural ceremony.
Sponsors
Sen. John Whitmire [D] | Rep. John Wray [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-09 - House - Adopted RV#6 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2019-01-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-01-15 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-01-09 | House | Record vote RV#6 |
2019-01-09 | House | Adopted |
2019-01-09 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-01-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Read |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--General
Governor
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Resolutions
Resolutions--Administration
Resolutions--Joint Session
Resolutions--Miscellaneous
Elections--General
Governor
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Resolutions
Resolutions--Administration
Resolutions--Joint Session
Resolutions--Miscellaneous