TX SCR3 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for procedures for the canvass of votes for the governor and lieutenant governor and the inauguration of the governor and lieutenant governor, and inviting the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on January 15, 2015.
Title
Providing for procedures for the canvass of votes for the governor and lieutenant governor and the inauguration of the governor and lieutenant governor, and inviting the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on January 15, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-14 - House - SCR 3Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-01-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-01-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-01-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-01-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-01-14 | House | Record vote |
2015-01-14 | House | Adopted |
2015-01-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-01-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Read |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--General
Governor
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Resolutions
Resolutions--Administration
Resolutions--Joint Session
Resolutions--Miscellaneous
Elections--General
Governor
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Resolutions
Resolutions--Administration
Resolutions--Joint Session
Resolutions--Miscellaneous