TX SCR28 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 2015 as Autism Awareness Month.
Title
Recognizing April 2015 as Autism Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Rep. Ron Simmons [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-21 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUTISM AWARENESS MONTH
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates