TX SCR26 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to amend federal law to allow states to provide for the consolidation of federally funded workforce development services with federally funded social safety net services.
Title
Urging Congress to amend federal law to allow states to provide for the consolidation of federally funded workforce development services with federally funded social safety net services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - House - Adopted RV#1973 (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-23 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1973 |
2023-05-23 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-20 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2023-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-04 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2023-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Human Services
Human Services--General
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Human Services--General
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress