TX SCR26 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress to review federal regulations on the oil and gas industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to review federal regulations on the oil and gas industry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Adopted RV#1769 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseAdopted
2017-05-24HouseLaid before the House
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Resolutions Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-09HouseReferred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
2017-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-10SenateRecord vote
2017-04-10SenateAdopted
2017-04-10SenateRecord vote
2017-04-10SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-04-10SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-10SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-10SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-30SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-28SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-07SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2017-03-07SenateRead first time
2017-02-23SenateFiled
2017-02-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback