TX SCR25 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing the Mount Tabor Indian Community for its contributions to this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the Mount Tabor Indian Community for its contributions to this state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-01 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-01HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-01SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-04-27SenateReported enrolled
2017-04-27SenateHouse passage reported
2017-04-27HouseAdopted
2017-04-27HouseLaid before the House
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in Rules and Resolutions
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2017-04-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-05SenateRead & adopted
2017-04-05SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-22SenateFiled
2017-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback