TX SCR24 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the United States Congress to continue joint federal-state funding of Texas Medicaid while transferring administration of the program to the Texas Legislature.
Title
Urging the United States Congress to continue joint federal-state funding of Texas Medicaid while transferring administration of the program to the Texas Legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2017-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |