TX SCR23 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-28 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-28 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the federal government to declare foreign drug cartels as foreign terrorist organizations.
Title
Urging the federal government to declare foreign drug cartels as foreign terrorist organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Border Security |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HCR78 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Referred to State Affairs
HCR79 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Referred to State Affairs
HCR78 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Referred to State Affairs
HCR79 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Referred to State Affairs
HCR78 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Referred to State Affairs