TX SCR21 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing November 4-8, 2013, and November 3-7, 2014, as Municipal Courts Week.
Title
Recognizing November 4-8, 2013, and November 3-7, 2014, as Municipal Courts Week.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-04-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-04-18 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-17 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-04-17 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-04-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
MUNICIPAL COURTS WEEK
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates