TX SCR16 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 12 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 12 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 13, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, February 19, 2019.
Title
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 13, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, February 19, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Adopted RV#30 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Adopted RV#30 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-02-11 | House | Record vote RV#30 |
2019-02-11 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-02-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |