TX SCR11 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-30 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-30 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the lieutenant governor and the speaker to appoint interim joint committees.
Title
Authorizing the lieutenant governor and the speaker to appoint interim joint committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - House - Adopted RV#2032 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-20 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to House Administration |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |