TX SCR11 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating May 22 of each year from 2011 through 2020 as William Elmo Merrem Day in honor of the first Eagle Scout from Texas.
Title
Designating May 22 of each year from 2011 through 2020 as William Elmo Merrem Day in honor of the first Eagle Scout from Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Adopted | |
2011-05-20 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-16 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-05-11 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | |
2011-03-24 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-24 | Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-24 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-16 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Administration | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time | |
2011-01-31 | Filed | |
2011-01-31 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--10-Year Significant Dates
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WILLIAM ELMO MERREM DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--10-Year Significant Dates
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WILLIAM ELMO MERREM DAY