TX SCR11 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Designating Bridgeport as the official Stagecoach Capital of Texas.
Title
Designating Bridgeport as the official Stagecoach Capital of Texas.
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Estes [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-25 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-24 | Record vote | |
2009-05-24 | Adopted | |
2009-05-24 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-15 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-01 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Government Organization | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-03 | Filed | |
2009-02-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BRIDGEPORT, CITY OF
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Capitals
STAGECOACH CAPITAL OF TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Capitals
STAGECOACH CAPITAL OF TEXAS