TX SB999 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to procedures for taking possession of a child and for certain hearings in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship involving the Department of Family and Protective Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to procedures for taking possession of a child and for certain hearings in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship involving the Department of Family and Protective Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1981 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Amended RV#1322 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-26HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18HouseRecord vote
2017-05-18HousePassed as amended
2017-05-18HouseAmended
2017-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-17HouseAmended
2017-05-17HouseAmended
2017-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-10HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-10HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Human Services
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-02HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-01SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenatePassed
2017-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01SenateAmended
2017-05-01SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01SenateAmended
2017-05-01SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-25SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-03-06SenateRead first time
2017-02-21SenateFiled
2017-02-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB999
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00999I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00999S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00999E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00999H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00999F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-01-F.PDF#page=160
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB999&RcdVtNo=1322&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB999&RcdVtNo=1981&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=43

Bill Comments

feedback