TX SB990 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to regulation of high occupancy vehicle lanes operated, managed, or maintained by a regional transportation authority; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to regulation of high occupancy vehicle lanes operated, managed, or maintained by a regional transportation authority; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-20 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-13 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-04-11 | Read first time | |
2011-04-05 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-04 | Record vote | |
2011-04-04 | Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-04 | Record vote | |
2011-04-04 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-04 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-04 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-04 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-24 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time | |
2011-02-28 | Filed | |
2011-02-28 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Highways
HOV & EXCLUSIVE LANES
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
HOV & EXCLUSIVE LANES
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road