TX SB985 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
Summary
Relating to the lodging expenses of certain state emergency services personnel.
Title
Relating to the lodging expenses of certain state emergency services personnel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time | |
2009-04-16 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-15 | Record vote | |
2009-04-15 | Passed | |
2009-04-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-15 | Record vote | |
2009-04-15 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-15 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-15 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-15 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-02-19 | Filed | |
2009-02-19 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
Salaries & Expenses
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
Salaries & Expenses
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions