TX SB983 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to restrictions on the assessment of the fee charged for issuance of certain birth records.
Title
Relating to restrictions on the assessment of the fee charged for issuance of certain birth records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-25 - House - SB 983Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Effective immediately | |
2015-05-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-25 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-25 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | House | Passed |
2015-05-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-13 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Statement(s) submitted |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BIRTH & DEATH CERTIFICATES
Elections
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Health
Health--General
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Elections
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Health
Health--General
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF