TX SB976 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the dissolution of the Falls County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1.
Title
Relating to the dissolution of the Falls County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-09 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-05-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2017-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
FALLS COUNTY WATER CONTROL AND IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.