TX SB975 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the security of high-speed rail operated by a private entity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the security of high-speed rail operated by a private entity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1495 (Y: 98 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HousePassed
2017-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-18HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-12HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-05-09HouseRead first time
2017-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-24SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-24SenateRecord vote
2017-04-24SenatePassed
2017-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-24SenateRecord vote
2017-04-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-24SenateRecord vote
2017-04-24SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-24SenateAmended
2017-04-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-24SenateRecord vote
2017-04-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-24SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-12SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-05SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-01SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-03-01SenateRead first time
2017-02-21SenateFiled
2017-02-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB975
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00975I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00975S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00975E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00975H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00975F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-24-F.PDF#page=26
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-24-F.PDF#page=28
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB975&RcdVtNo=1495&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-24-F.PDF#page=27

Bill Comments

feedback