TX SB974 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to policies and programs that permit the use of public money to finance political campaigns.
Title
Relating to policies and programs that permit the use of public money to finance political campaigns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Elections |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |