TX SB97 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to regulation of the sale, distribution, possession, use, and advertising of e-cigarettes, cigarettes, and tobacco products; amending provisions subject to a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to regulation of the sale, distribution, possession, use, and advertising of e-cigarettes, cigarettes, and tobacco products; amending provisions subject to a criminal penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-12 - House - SB 97Third Reading House (Y: 119 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - SB 97Third Reading House (Y: 123 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Rinaldi (Y: 98 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-28 See remarks for effective date
2015-05-28 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-18SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-18HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-18SenateRecord vote
2015-05-18SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2015-05-18SenateRead
2015-05-18SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2015-05-12SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2015-05-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-12HouseRecord vote
2015-05-12HousePassed
2015-05-12HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-11HouseRecord vote
2015-05-11HousePassed to 3rd reading
2015-05-11HousePoint of order overruled
2015-05-11HousePoint of order overruled
2015-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-11HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2015-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-05HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-05HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2015-05-05HouseRules suspended
2015-05-05HouseRecommitted to committee
2015-05-05HousePostponed
2015-05-05HousePoint of order withdrawn
2015-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-05HouseRecord vote
2015-05-05HouseAmendment tabled
2015-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-05HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2015-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-21HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-21HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-17HouseReferred to Public Health
2015-04-17HouseRead first time
2015-03-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-03-17SenateReported engrossed
2015-03-17SenateReason for vote recorded in Journal
2015-03-17SenateRecord vote
2015-03-17SenatePassed
2015-03-17SenateRead 3rd time
2015-03-17SenateRecord vote
2015-03-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-03-17SenateRecord vote
2015-03-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-03-17SenateRecord vote
2015-03-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-03-17SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-16SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-10SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-03-03SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-03-02SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-02-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-02-23SenateCo-author authorized
2015-02-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-02-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-02-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-02-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-01-26SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2015-01-26SenateRead first time
2014-11-10SenateFiled
2014-11-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB97
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB00097I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB00097S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB00097E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB00097H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB00097F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB97&RcdVtNo=628&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB97&RcdVtNo=903&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB97&RcdVtNo=968&Ch=H&Dt=05/12/2015

Bill Comments

feedback