TX SB969 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring certain public and private institutions of higher education to provide amnesty to students who report certain incidents, including sexual harassment, sexual assault, dating violence, or stalking.
Title
Relating to requiring certain public and private institutions of higher education to provide amnesty to students who report certain incidents, including sexual harassment, sexual assault, dating violence, or stalking.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1419 (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1419 (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-20 | House | Passed |
2017-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-19 | House | Amended |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-02 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SEXUAL ASSAULT