TX SB968 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to public health disaster and public health emergency preparedness and response; providing a civil penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public health disaster and public health emergency preparedness and response; providing a civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1507 (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective immediately
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31HouseHouse adopts resolution for tech. correction SCR 59
2021-05-31SenateSenate adopts resolution for tech. correction SCR 59
2021-05-30HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-30SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-05-30SenateRead
2021-05-30SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-28SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1507
2021-05-26HousePassed as amended
2021-05-26HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseAmended 5-Bucy, Klick, and Oliverson
2021-05-26HouseAmended 4-Stucky, Shine, Guillen, Guerra, Ashby, Fierro, and Lambert
2021-05-26HouseAmended 3-Guerra
2021-05-26HouseAmended 2-Oliverson, Klick, Toth, and C. Bell
2021-05-26HouseAmended 1-Klick
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-25HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-25HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-21HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-28HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-28HouseRead first time
2021-04-22HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-21SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-21SenateRecord vote
2021-04-21SenatePassed
2021-04-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-21SenateRecord vote
2021-04-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21SenateAmended
2021-04-21SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Perry
2021-04-21SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-21SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-20SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-31SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-03SenateFiled
2021-03-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB968
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00968I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00968S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00968E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00968H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00968F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00968S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00968H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00968H32.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00968H33.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00968H34.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00968H35.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00968I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00968I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00968S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00968S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00968E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00968H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00968F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00968F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-21-F.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB968&RcdVtNo=1507&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-21-F.PDF#page=9

Bill Comments

feedback