TX SB968 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a sexual assault policy at certain public and private institutions of higher education and to requiring those institutions to provide students and employees an option to electronically report certain offenses to the institution.
Title
Relating to a sexual assault policy at certain public and private institutions of higher education and to requiring those institutions to provide students and employees an option to electronically report certain offenses to the institution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1991 (Y: 120 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1418 (Y: 124 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1991 (Y: 120 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1418 (Y: 124 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2017-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-20 | House | Passed |
2017-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-19 | House | Amended |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-02 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-04-19 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Family Violence
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SEXUAL ASSAULT
STALKING
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Family Violence
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SEXUAL ASSAULT
STALKING