TX SB953 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the conditions for granting an occupational license to certain persons, the monitoring of those persons by a local community supervision and corrections department, and the fees associated with department services.
Title
Relating to the conditions for granting an occupational license to certain persons, the monitoring of those persons by a local community supervision and corrections department, and the fees associated with department services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-21 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-20 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Passed | |
2011-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-20 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-06 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-04 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Corrections | |
2011-04-29 | Read first time | |
2011-04-28 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-28 | Record vote | |
2011-04-28 | Passed | |
2011-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-28 | Record vote | |
2011-04-28 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-28 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-28 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time | |
2011-02-25 | Filed | |
2011-02-25 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
DRUG & ALCOHOL TESTING
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
OCCUPATIONAL DRIVER'S LICENSE
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
OCCUPATIONAL DRIVER'S LICENSE
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID