TX SB952 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to enforcement of a lien on property in a self-service storage facility by a sale conducted through an Internet website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to enforcement of a lien on property in a self-service storage facility by a sale conducted through an Internet website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-27 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HousePassed
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-09HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-08HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-28SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-01SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-01SenateRead first time
2017-02-17SenateFiled
2017-02-17SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback