TX SB95 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of raw milk and raw milk products; adding a provision subject to a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of raw milk and raw milk products; adding a provision subject to a criminal penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-03SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2016-11-14SenateFiled
2016-11-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback