TX SB905 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Cresson Crossroads Municipal Utility District No. 2; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Cresson Crossroads Municipal Utility District No. 2; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective immediately
2017-06-09 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-19HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-05-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-10SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenatePassed
2017-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-04SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-04SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateRecommendations filed with the Senate
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2017-02-28SenateRead first time
2017-02-15SenateTransmitted to the Governor
2017-02-15SenateFiled
2017-02-15SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback